Virmani, Vivek (CPSO#: 91946)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Aligarh Muslim University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 12 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 13 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2013