Visbal Amador, Fernando Antonio (CPSO#: 80230)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Juan N. Corpas, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Visbal Amador & Gonzalez Porras Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 6 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Safestor Records Management 2704 RR 20 Fonthill ON L0S 1E6 Tel: (905) 892-0010
Instructions: Patients should contact Safestor Records Management to request a copy of their medical records
Date Received: 05 Sep 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Colombia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FERNANDO ANTONIO VISBAL AMADOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VISBAL AMADOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008