Visram, Hasina (CPSO#: 88749)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 210
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 680-9092
Fax: (613) 680-9093
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Varghese Visram Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Varghese ( CPSO# 86757 )
Dr. H. Visram ( CPSO# 88749 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
210 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 680-9092

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 19 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HASINA VISRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VISRAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 19 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Dec 2011 to 19 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 20 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 19 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 20 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 19 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2012