Visvanatha, Susmita Acharyya (CPSO#: 72605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: Acharyya, Susmita (used until: 09 Jun 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bramalea Medical Group
Unit 202
9780 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON  L6S 2P1
Phone: (905) 791-2390
Fax: (905) 791-8476
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Oct 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSMITA ACHARYYA VISVANATHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VISVANATHA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 15 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2000