Viswabandya, Auro (CPSO#: 92121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Apr 2015

Expiry Date:  22 Apr 2022

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Apr 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Oriya

Education:Utkal University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology
and Hematology
Room 6-323 700 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 3256
Fax: (416) 946-4407
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Auro Viswabandya Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Viswabandya ( CPSO# 92121 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Oncology and Hematology
610 University Avenue
Suite 5-110
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Room 6-323
Department of Medical Oncology and Hematology
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 23 Apr 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Apr 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 08 Dec 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 09 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Apr 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 22 Apr 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Auro Viswabandya may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Haematology, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Viswabandya holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Viswabandya  no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Viswabandya's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Viswabandya's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on April 23, 2015.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on April 22, 2022.