Vitaro, Maryann (CPSO#: 72394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2001

Summary

Former Name: Krnezich, Maryann (used until: 23 Aug 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Salus Medical Centre
2640 Rutherford Rd.
Suite 202
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H3
Phone: (905) 856-0771
Fax: (905) 417-0765
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jan 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARYANN VITARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VITARO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Jan 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2001