Vivoda, Edward Ernest (CPSO#: 75971)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Jul 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
113 John St. South
Aylmer ON  N5H 2C3
Phone: (519) 765-1960
Fax: (519) 765-2971
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Thomas Walk In Clinic Aylmer
Suite 105
230 First Avenue
St Thomas ON  N5R 4P5
Canada
Phone: (519) 633-9628
Fax: (519) 633-2677
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Vivoda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Vivoda ( CPSO# 75971 )

Business Address:
113 John Street South
Aylmer ON  N5H 2C3
Phone Number: (519) 765-1960

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2001
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Apr 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 19 Jul 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 19 Jul 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from July 19, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Edward Ernest Vivoda
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Vivoda to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. EDWARD VIVODA
                                          ("Dr. Vivoda")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.

            (2)   I, Dr. Vivoda, certificate of registration number 75971, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Vivoda, acknowledge that following a public complaint that raised
                  concerns about my professional communications and my standard of practice
                  in family medicine, the College initiated an investigation bearing File
                  Number 0107812 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged in
                  professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my practice of family
                  medicine and my professional communications.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Vivoda, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").



            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Vivoda, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   individualized instruction in professional communications
                              satisfactory to the College, with an instructor selected by
                              the College;
                  
                        (ii)  Review of the College Practice Guide: Medical Professionalism
                              and College Policies, to be discussed with the instructor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Vivoda, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Vivoda, undertake to initiate contact with the instructor
                        within one (1) month of the Effective Date.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Vivoda, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Vivoda, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Locations"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Vivoda, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Vivoda, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Vivoda, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "B". 
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Vivoda, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking. 

            (8)   I, Dr. Vivoda, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Vivoda, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Vivoda, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Vivoda, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (12)  I, Dr. Vivoda, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Vivoda, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Vivoda, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (12)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Vivoda
                              engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in
                              the practice of family medicine and in his professional
                              communications. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Vivoda will engage in professional education in
                                    professional communication.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Vivoda, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Vivoda, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education: 

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Vivoda, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Vivoda, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff,
                  to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (c)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Edward Ernest Vivoda to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective June 5, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Vivoda engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of family medicine and in his professional communications. As a result of the investigation:

- Dr. Vivoda will engage in professional education in professional communication.