Vlachou, Paraskevi (CPSO#: 90004)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Nov 2013

Expiry Date:  01 Nov 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Nov 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:University of Leicester, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
St. Michael`s Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. A. Zalev ( CPSO# 24495 )
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. G. Mnatzakanian ( CPSO# 88831 )
Dr. J. Barfett ( CPSO# 84352 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Corporation Name: Paraskevi Vlachou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )

Business Address:
Department of Medical Imaging
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 02 Nov 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 12 Dec 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 13 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 01 Nov 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Paraskevi Vlachou may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging, Division of Abdominal Imaging, University of Toronto, in
                        which Dr. Vlachou holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Vlachou  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Vlachou's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Vlachou's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on November 2, 2013.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on November 1, 2020.