Vlahovich, Alexandra Tanja (CPSO#: 82634)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare Georgetown
1 Princess Anne Dr.
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111 Ext. 8505
Fax: (905) 873-2953
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

208-1306 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Canada
Phone: 416-923-6970
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Tanja Vlahovich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vlahovich ( CPSO# 82634 )

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare Georgetown
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA TANJA VLAHOVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VLAHOVICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007