Vlaovic, Branislav (CPSO#: 25494)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Branislav Vlaovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 5 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Appletree Medical 1450 O'Connor Dr Unit 20 Toronto ON M4B 2T8
Date Received: 26 Apr 2018


Address: Appletree Medical Group Building 1 Suite 20 1450 O'Connor Drive East York ON M4B 2T8 Tel: 647-722-2370 Fax: 416-367-4301
Date Received: 27 Nov 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018