Vo, Khanh Hong (CPSO#: 72821)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Universite de Hue, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
2065 Finch Avenue West
Suite 108
North York ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 746-7506
Fax: (416) 746-7553
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khanh Vo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Vo ( CPSO# 72821 )

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
Suite 108
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 746-7506

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHANH HONG VO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000