Vo, Thoi Hen (CPSO#: 52173)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 11 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:University of Saigon, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S. North York, ON M3J 1Y6 www.GetMyMedRecord.ca Phone: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 17 May 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jun 2018