Vogel, Christine Patricia (CPSO#: 72351)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 766-1360
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jul 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE PATRICIA VOGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOGEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 29 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2000 to 28 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2001