Vohra, Anita (CPSO#: 72675)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Oct 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 801-1004
Fax: (416) 977-0974
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Vohra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vohra ( CPSO# 72675 )

Business Address:
Suite 304
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 801-1004

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANITA VOHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOHRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2004