Vohra, Manoj (CPSO#: 90247)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manoj Vohra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 27 2013

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2016