Voineskos, Daphne Zaharoula Ageliki (CPSO#: 91847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Nottingham, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Centre for Addiction and
Mental Health
Unit 4-1 Room 117
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAPHNE ZAHAROULA AGELIKI VOINESKOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOINESKOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2009 to 07 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 08 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014