Voinov, Valentin (CPSO#: 95935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Nov 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Medical University of Debrecen, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J2C5
Canada
Phone: 416-2226160 Ext. 268
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Valentin Voinov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Voinov ( CPSO# 95935 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 222-6160

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Jun 2011 to 28 Jul 2011
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Valentin  Voinov may practise medicine independently in internal medicine,
            only.