Vojdani, Omid Kyle (CPSO#: 88245)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 7734
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queen's Quay Medical
10 Lower Jarvis St.
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2
Canada
Phone: (647) 827-9200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O. Vojdani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Vojdani ( CPSO# 88245 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580


Corporation Name: Dr. Merle Vojdani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vojdani ( CPSO# 59070 )
Dr. O. Vojdani ( CPSO# 88245 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Division of Oncology
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4378

Business Address:
Unit B
158 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3E9
Phone Number: (519) 888-6655

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OMID KYLE VOJDANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOJDANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2008