Volochniouk, Daniela (CPSO#: 93872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
840 McConnell
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4242 Ext. 4274
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniela Volochniouk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Volochniouk ( CPSO# 93872 )

Business Address:
4th Floor
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELA VOLOCHNIOUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOLOCHNIOUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 22 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2015