Vora, Harshala Parag (CPSO#: 84198)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone: (905) 575-1300
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Vora ( CPSO# 84198 )
Dr. P. Vora ( CPSO# 81610 )

Business Address:
Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 575-1300

Business Address:
Department of Radiology
HHS - McMaster University Medical Centre
2S28 - 1200 Main Street
P O Box 2000
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARSHALA PARAG VORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VORA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 May 2006 to 03 Aug 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 04 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2008