Vora, Raaj (CPSO#: 92959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 Frederick Street
Orillia ON  L3V5W6
Phone: 7054181100
Fax: 8884980060
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raaj Vora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Vora ( CPSO# 92959 )

Business Address:
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 418-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAAJ VORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VORA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 01 Jan 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015