Vora, Sneha (CPSO#: 77438)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2015

Expiry Date:  17 Dec 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Dec 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili, Tulu, Urdu

Education:University of Bombay, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Iroquois Ridge Medical Centre
Unit B5
360 Dundas Street East
Oakville ON  L6H 6Z9
Phone: (905) 257-8777
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Dec 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 May 2002 to 06 Jul 2002
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Oct 2003
International Specialist Physician - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Dec 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 17 Dec 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Sneha Vora may practise family medicine at the Iroquois Ridge Medical
                  Centre  in  Oakville,  Ontario,  while under supervision coordinated by a
                  supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  three  years from
                  the  date of issuance or when Dr. Vora's eligibility to take the  College
                  of Family  Physicians  of  Canada  examination  expires,  whichever comes
                  first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon  the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Vora's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the
                        required  reports  to the College by the due date or if the reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Vora's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on  December  18, 2015, and will expire on or
                  before December 17, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.