Vosoughi, Reza (CPSO#: 90201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences Center
820 Sherbrook Street
G F 543
Winnipeg MB  R3A 1R9
Phone: (204) 787-1742
Fax: (204) 787-1486

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 24 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REZA VOSOUGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOSOUGHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 02 Feb 2009 to 24 Apr 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 25 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2013