Vyas, Tarren (CPSO#: 90914)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Josephs Health Centre Department of Lab Medicine Room 3G-102 30 The Queensway Toronto, ON M6R 1B5
Date Received: 29 Jan 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jan 2016