Vyver, Ellie Elizabeth (CPSO#: 79203)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Adolescent Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Adolescent Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2012