Waddington, Ashley (CPSO#: 92211)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 533 6276
Fax: 613 548 1330
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashley Waddington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Waddington ( CPSO# 92211 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 29 Jul 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHLEY WADDINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADDINGTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 26 Oct 2009 to 23 Nov 2009
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 15 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2013