Wade, Kevin Akhena (CPSO#: 105143)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Electoral District: 02

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 03 Nov 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

Queen's University, 18 Nov 2014 to 31 Oct 2015
Elective Trainee - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2018 to 24 Nov 2018
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2015