Wadhera, Vishal Sunderlal (CPSO#: 83177)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Amravati University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 22 Jun 2005 to 19 Jul 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 20 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008