Wadsworth, Kristin Marie (CPSO#: 95673)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
700 University Avenue
8th floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4566
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTIN MARIE WADSWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WADSWORTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 07 Feb 2017 to 10 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 13 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2016