Wahalawatta, Punsara Dasuni (CPSO#: 94566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Nov 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Primacy Family First Health Centre
PO Box 51031
375 Des Epinettes
Orleans ON  K1E 3E0
Phone: (613) 841-7009
Fax: (613) 841-0106
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Primacy Family First Health Centre
4270 Innes Road
Orleans ON  K4A 5E6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wahalawatta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wahalawatta ( CPSO# 94566 )

Business Address:
Primacy Family First Health Centre
375 Des Epinettes
P.O. Box 51031
Orleans ON  K1E 3E0
Phone Number: (613) 841-7009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Mar 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Punsara  Dasuni  Wahalawatta may practice medicine independently in Family
            Medicine, only.