Wahay, Leigh Rose (CPSO#: 73636)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Lanark County CNC
207 Robertson Road
Lanark ON  K0G 1K0
Phone: (613) 259-2182
Fax: (613) 259-5235
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Perth and Smith Falls
District Hospital
GWM Site
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Canada
Phone: (613) 267-1500
Fax: (613) 259-2182
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.R. Wahay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Wahay ( CPSO# 73636 )

Business Address:
Perth and Smith Falls
District Hospital
GWM Site
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-1500

Business Address:
North Lanark County CNC
207 Roberston Road
Lanark ON  K0G 1K0
Phone Number: (613) 259-2182

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEIGH ROSE WAHAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAHAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001