Waidyaratne-Wijeratne, Nishardi Tharu (CPSO#: 93947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala

Education:University of Colombo, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
166, Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544 3310 Ext. 2538
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D Wijeratne & N Waidyaratne-Wijeratne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wijeratne ( CPSO# 93946 )
Dr. N. Waidyaratne-Wijeratne ( CPSO# 93947 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NISHARDI THARU WAIDYARATNE-WIJERATNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAIDYARATNE-WIJERATNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015