Waisglass, Barry Ronald (CPSO#: 26501)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Canadian Cababis Clinics 2 - 80 King St St. Catherines ON L2R 7G1
Date Received: 18 May 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 7, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Barry Ronald Waisglass to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 7, 2017:

Dr. Waisglass has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.