Wakeam, Elliot Samuel Faris (CPSO#: 93196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Thomas Jefferson University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Thoracic Surgery
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416 340-5354
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELLIOT SAMUEL FARIS WAKEAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAKEAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2017