Wald, Rachel Maya (CPSO#: 72307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Names: Dayan-Wald, Rachel Maya (used until: 22 Nov 2007 )     Dayan, Rachel Maya (used until: 02 May 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Room 5N 517
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-5502
Fax: (416) 340-5014
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wald ( CPSO# 73865 )
Dr. R. Wald ( CPSO# 72307 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Nephrology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 867-3703

Business Address:
University Health Network
585 University Avenue
Room 5N-517
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-5502

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 22 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL MAYA WALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2002