Wald, Ron (CPSO#: 73865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:McGill University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Nephrology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 867-3703
Fax: (416) 593-6275
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wald ( CPSO# 73865 )
Dr. R. Wald ( CPSO# 72307 )

Business Address:
University Health Network
585 University Avenue
Room 5N-517
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-5502

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Nephrology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 867-3703

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RON WALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 14 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003