Waldron, Leslie Allen (CPSO#: 68037)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
945 Gardiners Road
Kingston ON  K7M 7H4
Phone: (613) 532-0900
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston Cosmetic Institute
945 Gardiners Road
Kingston ON  K7M 7H4
Canada
Phone: (613) 532-0900
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.A. Waldron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Waldron ( CPSO# 68037 )

Business Address:
Grand Valley Institution for Women
1575 Homer Watson Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2P 2C5

Business Address:
20-20 Eye Exam Clinic
945 Gardiners Road
Kingston ON  K7M 7H4
Phone Number: (613) 544-0200

Business Address:
MilHaven Penitentiary
Hwy 33, PO Box 33
Bath ON  K0H 1G0

Business Address:
Kingston Cosmetic Institute
945 Gardiners Road
Kingston ON  K7M 7H4
Phone Number: (613) 532-0900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE ALLEN WALDRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALDRON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1996