Wale, Jason Todd (CPSO#: 74423)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2001 to 24 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 2003