Walele, Abdul Aziz (CPSO#: 73022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Zimbabwe, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
3 Conestoga Drive
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone: (905) 216-0238
Fax: (905) 497-6114
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdul Aziz Walele Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Walele ( CPSO# 73022 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
3 Connestoga Drive
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone Number: (905) 216-0238

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3S7

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

South Africa

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Mar 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 31 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDUL AZIZ WALELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALELE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2002 to 30 Apr 2003
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2000
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2008