Walfish, Paul Gerald (CPSO#: 17226)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Date of Death: 28-Jul-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Sinai Health System 413-600 University Avenue Toronto ON M5G 1X5 Tel: (416) 586-4800 ext. 4437 Fax: (416) 5868861 Email: ian.witterick@sinaihealthsystem.ca c/o pat. gartley@sinaihealthsystem.ca
Date Received: 24 Jul 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018