Walgama, Babarenda Guruge Shiromi Dilrukshi (CPSO#: 87109)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Colombo, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 124
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 946-0171
Fax: (519) 971-9120
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shiromi Walgama Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Walgama ( CPSO# 87109 )

Business Address:
Suite 124
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 946-0171

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BABARENDA GURUGE SHIROMI DILRUKSHI WALGAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALGAMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2010