Wali, Dilip (CPSO#: 91349)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Calcutta, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Queensway West
Suite 110
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone: (905) 897-0788
Fax: (905) 897-9229
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dilip Wali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wali ( CPSO# 91349 )

Business Address:
Suite 110
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 897-0788

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 01 May 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 01 May 2014 Active View Details [+]
            --  As  from  May  1,  2014,  the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of  registration  held  by  Dr.  Dilip  Wali,  in
            accordance  with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Wali to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Effective  immediately,  Dr.  Wali  shall  not engage in any professional
                  encounters with female patients of any age,  in  any jurisdiction, unless
                  the patient encounter takes place in the presence  of  a female regulated
                  health  professional, and unless the other requirements provided  in  his
                  Undertaking  with  the  College  are fulfilled.  For further clarity, Dr.
                  Wali may not be alone with any female  patient,  during  any professional
                  encounter.
                  
                  
            --  Dr.  Dilip  Wali may practise medicine independently in internal  medicine,
            only.

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: June 28, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)