Walia, Gautam (CPSO#: 91859)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Uxbridge Site
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1R5
Phone: (905) 852-9771
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAUTAM WALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Jan 2012 to 04 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2014