Walji, Sakina (CPSO#: 97822)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Imperial College School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Academic Family Health
Granovsky Gluskin Family Medicine
Centre
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5160
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Walji ( CPSO# 97822 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Academic Family Health
Granovsky Gluskin Family
Medicine Centre
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAKINA WALJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014