Walker, Emily (CPSO#: 95861)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: Leclair, Emily (used until: 14 Dec 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Obstetrics
and Gynecology
501 Smyth Road, Box 804
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7777
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 19 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 25 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 20 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 17 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 17 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2016