Walker, Janet Alison (CPSO#: 74117)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 23 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009