Walker, Peter (CPSO#: 46562)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital 501 Smyth Rd Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6 Phone: 613-722-7000
Date Received: 10 Jul 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 2018