Wallace, Kerrett Hugh Washington (CPSO#: 94805)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Feb 2011 to 11 Mar 2011
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 2016