Wallace, Rebecca Nicole (CPSO#: 95842)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Medical Family Practice
20 Wynford Drive, Suite 110
North York ON  M3C 1J4
Phone: (416) 551-1707
Fax: (416) 800-2430
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Mar 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA NICOLE WALLACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLACE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2014