Walley, Virginia Margaret (CPSO#: 32588)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jan 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LifeLabs
Medical-Scientific Department
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone: 416-675-4530
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V.M. Walley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Walley ( CPSO# 32588 )

Business Address:
Life Labs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 08 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIRGINIA MARGARET WALLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1983